U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Van Asperen v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 21, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • May 14, 2018: [Remand]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Declaration]
  • April 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • February 09, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 29, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 22, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 20, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 20, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 19, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 19, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.