U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00391
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Idaho County Light and Power Cooperative Association, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 07, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 27, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 18, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • December 13, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 04, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Statement]
  • November 08, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 01, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Declaration]
  • October 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 21, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • June 11, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 11, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order]
  • April 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 12, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.