U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00390
  • Case Name: Stellar Records, LLC v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • October 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Declaration]
  • August 20, 2018: [Default Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 04, 2018: [Compel]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 02, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • November 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Appendix]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 20, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • September 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 19, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.