U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00392
  • Case Name: Moen v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • December 11, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • December 05, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 02, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 22, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 20, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.