U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Dixon v. Yordy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • May 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.