U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00393
  • Case Name: Rendon v. Yordy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.