U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00388
  • Case Name: Roberts v. Wasden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 09, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • February 04, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 07, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 20, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.