U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00395
  • Case Name: Pagano v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 28, 2019: [Declaration]
  • January 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • February 20, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • February 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 25, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 25, 2017: [Petition for Review]
  • September 25, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.