U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00400
  • Case Name: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Walker Land & Cattle LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2018: [Appellees Brief]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Excerpt of Record]
  • November 30, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 24, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Designations of Record]
  • October 04, 2017: [Certificate of Readiness]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.