U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00404
  • Case Name: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Return Mail]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 30, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 30, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 23, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 20, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • October 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Expedite]
  • October 04, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 02, 2017: [Summons Issued]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.