U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00403
  • Case Name: Timmons v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • February 14, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • February 13, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 28, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.