U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00402
  • Case Name: Matthews v. Kootenai County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 02, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 01, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 01, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 09, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 08, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.