U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00405
  • Case Name: Progessive Specialty Insurance Co et al v. Tiffin Motor Homes, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 18, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 05, 2019: [In Limine]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2019: [Compel]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 25, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 25, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Vacate]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 22, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 12, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 17, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2017: [Litigation Order]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 16, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 16, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 13, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2017: [Docket Annotation - Division Change]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.