U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00406
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 09, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Response (generic)]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 20, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • January 30, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 03, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 29, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.