U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00408
  • Case Name: Wildlands Defense et al v. Seesholtz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 23, 2018: [Appeal Transcript]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 11, 2018: [Supplement]
  • May 11, 2018: [Stay]
  • May 11, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 04, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 04, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2017: [File Amicus Brief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Strike]
  • November 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 30, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 30, 2017: [Intervene]
  • October 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 26, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 17, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.