U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00409
  • Case Name: Daniel v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 19, 2018: [Stay]
  • July 03, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 09, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 04, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.