U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00407
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Jacksons Food Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Consent Decree]
  • December 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2018: [Settlement]
  • December 13, 2018: [Settlement Agreement]
  • December 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Status Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Consent Filed]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Status Report]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.