U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00412
  • Case Name: Abdilnour v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 03, 2021: [Strike]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Compel]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Protective Order]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • March 19, 2020: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Litigation Order]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 03, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.