U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00398
  • Case Name: Seiber et al v. Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 14, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 07, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 05, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 06, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 03, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 03, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.