U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00410
  • Case Name: Taylor v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • September 05, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 05, 2019: [Counterclaim]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • August 29, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 07, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 20, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 19, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 19, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 20, 2017: [Counterclaim]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 04, 2017: [Docket Annotation - Division Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.