U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00413
  • Case Name: Williams v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 12, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • February 09, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 29, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 20, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 10, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 05, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.