U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00417
  • Case Name: SISSON et al v. RJC TRUCKING, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • May 23, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • May 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 23, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 12, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 12, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 07, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 10, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 10, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 09, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.