U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00416
  • Case Name: Robson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 11, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • August 28, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Statement]
  • August 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Supplement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 07, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Seal]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 29, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Errata]
  • January 04, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 03, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 09, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.