U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00418
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Kootenai County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 21, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 11, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • October 17, 2018: [Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 30, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 02, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 22, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 23, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 09, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.