U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00420
  • Case Name: Schindelbeck v. Brumbaugh
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sanctions]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 23, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • April 23, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 09, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 09, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 19, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.