U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00411
  • Case Name: Emrit v. Denney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Complaint]
  • October 10, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.