U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Crisostomoa v. Target Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 20, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 20, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 27, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 21, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 12, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • October 11, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.