U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00421
  • Case Name: McCoy v. Eliason et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 27, 2019: [Strike]
  • February 13, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Request]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 15, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • April 12, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Request]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Complaint]
  • October 10, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 10, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.