U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00342
  • Case Name: Regan v. HDR Engineering, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [In Limine]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2019: [Statement]
  • July 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 14, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 21, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 15, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 15, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 13, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 13, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 12, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 12, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • November 13, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.