U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00423
  • Case Name: Advocates for the West, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 17, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.