U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00424
  • Case Name: Robinett et al v. Loancare, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 27, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Litigation Order]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 26, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 16, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 16, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 12, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • October 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 12, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.