U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00429
  • Case Name: Law v. Andersen Manufacturing Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 15, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 09, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.