U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00426
  • Case Name: Mikolas et al vs. University of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 20, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 17, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.