U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00451
  • Case Name: Short v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Errata]
  • April 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2018: [Response (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • November 01, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.