U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00455
  • Case Name: De Luna v. Eastern Idaho Railroad, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 10, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 02, 2018: [Consent Filed]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 02, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 01, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.