U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00454
  • Case Name: Byerly et al v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Stay]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 13, 2018: [Stay]
  • February 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2018: [Supplement]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 22, 2018: [Receipt]
  • January 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 19, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 17, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 12, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 03, 2018: [Stay]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 21, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2017: [Stay]
  • December 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 08, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 02, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.