U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00456
  • Case Name: Arave v. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 08, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 07, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • November 02, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.