U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00459
  • Case Name: Tetzner v. Hazel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 09, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 15, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 11, 2019: [Litigation Order]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Litigation Order]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2018: [Seal]
  • September 17, 2018: [Reconsideration]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Compel]
  • December 04, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 07, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.