U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00460
  • Case Name: Kiedrowski v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 07, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 05, 2018: [1-Exparte Document-to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • April 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • February 09, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 07, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 06, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 06, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.