U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00461
  • Case Name: JIANG et al v. Sessions et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 13, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.