U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00458
  • Case Name: McCabe v. Idaho State Board of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 25, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Recusal]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 08, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 08, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 08, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.