U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00462
  • Case Name: Walker v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Response (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • November 08, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.