U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00464
  • Case Name: G v. Idaho Department of Juvenile Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • November 27, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.