U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00465
  • Case Name: S&S Worldwide, Inc. v. Aeron Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 06, 2018: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 02, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Litigation Order]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 12, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 30, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 13, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.