U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00466
  • Case Name: Clark et al v. Podesta
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 20, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 15, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.