U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00468
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. Lodge
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • December 12, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 08, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • November 16, 2017: [Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2017: [Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.