U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00469
  • Case Name: DeJong v. Idaho State Board of Medicine
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.