U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00470
  • Case Name: Herridge v. Sirman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 12, 2018: [Substitute Party]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 13, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 09, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 01, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 15, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.