U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00472
  • Case Name: Idaho Conservation League v. Pruitt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 11, 2018: [Stay]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 11, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 19, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 19, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Status Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Litigation Order]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 16, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.