U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00377
  • Case Name: Houpt v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Memorandum]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 22, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 05, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Take Deposition]
  • November 13, 2018: [Declaration]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 23, 2018: [Statement]
  • October 23, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 23, 2018: [Declaration]
  • October 23, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 02, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 10, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 29, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 26, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 12, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 03, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [Status Report]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.